THE ROYAL ASYLUM OF THE ST ANN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 313639
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 26TH MARCH 1929 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS UNDER S.74 AND S.75 CHARITIES ACT 1993 EFFECTIVE 4 JULY 2000 AND BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 4TH DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED ON 14/05/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE EDUCATION, MAINTENANCE AND CLOTHING FOR CHILDREN OF PARENTS WHO HAVE SEEN BETTER DAYS AT SOME SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS SELECTED BY THE TRUSTEE, WHERE THEY MAY RECEIVE AN EDUCATION AND INSTRUCTION IN RELIGIOUS AND USEFUL KNOWLEDGE AGREEABLE TO THE FORMULARIES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 25 July 1963 : registered
  • 11 September 2017 : removed (AMALGAMATED)
Other names
  • THE ROYAL ASYLUM OF THE ST ANN'S SOCIETY (Previous name)
  • THE ROYAL ASYLUM OF THE ST ANN'S SOCIETY NEW ENDOWMENT FUND (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • Education/training
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Individuals