WOODBROOKE QUAKER STUDY CENTRE

Charity number: 313816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.84m £1.87m £1.80m £1.83m £1.74m
Total expenditure £2.08m £2.05m £2.14m £2.24m £2.11m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £320.19k £393.30k £374.86k £333.05k £375.21k
Income - Other trading activities £569.24k £479.76k £579.17k £575.84k £581.54k
Income - Charitable activities £820.23k £878.40k £786.44k £827.47k £699.76k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £34.70k £0 £0
Income - Investment £104.77k £105.97k £98.29k £87.67k £78.63k
Income - Other £21.54k £10.17k £656 £1.42k £1.07k
Income - Legacies £78.10k £84.28k £5.58k £48 £79.32k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.60m £1.61m £1.69m £1.77m £1.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £433.43k £450.11k £477.17k £6.71k
Expenditure - Governance £66.86k £0 £63.31k £65.17k £70.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £438.34k