THE OXFORD COLLEGES ADMISSIONS OFFICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 November 1964: Standard registration
- 17 December 2007: Removed (Exempt charity)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.30m | £1.37m | £1.39m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.23m | £1.86m | £1.43m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 31 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 31 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 30 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 30 December 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 12TH MAY 1964 AS AMENDED 17TH MAY 2001 AS AMENDED 6TH OCTOBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN AN OFFICE IN THE CITY OF OXFORD OR ELSEWHERE IN ENGLAND FOR THE PURPOSE OF ASSISTING SOCIETIES WHICH ARE ENTITLED TO PRESENT CANDIDATES TO THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD FOR MATRICULATION IN DEALING WITH APPLICATIONS FROM PERSONS DESIRING TO BECOME MEMBERS OF THOSE SOCIETIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window