THE DOCTOR DOROTHY JORDAN LLOYD MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 313933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust makes travel grants to people who work in the leather industry or who are studying leather related subjects.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £7,223
Total expenditure: £2,617

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 May 1961: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicholas Muirhead Trustee 02 March 2023
BRITISH LEATHER INDUSTRY DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Andrew Bailey Trustee 23 January 2019
BRITISH LEATHER INDUSTRY DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Jonathan Loxston Trustee 06 January 2016
BRITISH LEATHER INDUSTRY DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Michael Dodd Trustee 29 January 2013
BRITISH LEATHER INDUSTRY DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
MR JAMES LANG Trustee
BRITISH LEATHER INDUSTRY DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
GRAHAM LAMPARD PHD FSLTC Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £6.73k £5.68k £6.60k £7.07k £7.22k
Total expenditure £500 £500 £10.55k £3.31k £2.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 24 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 28 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 21 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 24 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 13 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PO Box 71
LLANGOLLEN
Clwyd
LL20 9BP
Phone:
07513412569
Website:

No information available