Accounts and annual returns DR PREM NATH BERRY EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 314144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window