Financial history DR PREM NATH BERRY EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 314144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £79.02k £4.43k £67.74k £4.50k £5.40k
Total expenditure £29.23k £22.01k £8.98k £11.36k £12.77k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A