MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )

Charity number: 314195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 22 January 2017 On time Download