Financial history MACKENZIE BELL TRUST FUND (IN CONNECTION WITH THE LONDON MUSEUM )

Charity number: 314195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £49.82k £52.01k £53.39k £56.98k £57.51k
Total expenditure £9.56k £2.51k £54.98k £66.44k £8.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A