THE INCORPORATED SOCIETY OF VALUERS AND AUCTIONEERS STUDENTS' AID FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 February 1970: Standard registration
- 15 December 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 15 December 2009: Funds transferred to 261245 THE ROYAL INSTITUTION OF CHARTERED SURVEYORS' BENE...
- THE STUDENTS AID FUND (ICW THE INCORPORATE SOCIETY OF VALUERS AND AUCTIONEERS) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.04k | £5.02k | £6.97k | £7.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | 10 June 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | 13 April 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16TH FEBRUARY 1970
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS DESIRING TO ENTER OR IN COURSE OF TRAINING FOR ANY OF THE PROFESSIONS OF VALUERS AUCTIONEERS ESTATE AGENTS AND SURVEYORS INCLUDING CANDIDATES FOR THE EXAMINATIONS OF THE SOCIETY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window