SACRED HEART SCHOOL BEECHWOOD TRUST LTD

Charity number: 325104

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Annette Elizabeth Taylor Trustee 12 March 2020 None on record
Sally Shankland Trustee 27 November 2018 None on record
Gillian Anne Hill Trustee 03 March 2016 None on record
MICHAEL SOUTHERN Trustee None on record
JONATHAN PAUL EMERY Trustee 02 March 2017
DARTFORD ARTS CENTRE Received: On time
THE DOREEN BIRD FOUNDATION Received: 162 days late
MICHAEL FRANCIS STEVENS Trustee 06 August 2013 None on record
Constance Ann Williams Chair 16 June 2016 None on record
Arthur Hamilton Trustee 26 November 2019 None on record
PENELOPE SUSAN EDGAR Trustee 02 August 2017 None on record