ST MARYLEBONE CAMP OF WILLIAM ELLIS SCHOOL

Charity number: 325110
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN MITCHELL Trustee 14 October 2018 None on record
Isabella Jones Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
MRS G MCCUTHEON Trustee 16 May 2019 None on record
T E WALTON ESQ Trustee 14 February 2018 None on record
SIR JACK WATSON Trustee 10 January 2020 None on record
MR OMAR CAMILLE HARMON Chair 13 June 2020 None on record
DEREK GARNER JOHN Trustee
THE BIRKBECK AND WILLIAM ELLIS SCHOOLS TRUST Received: On time
MARY FEILDING GUILD Received: On time
BIRKBECK AND WILLIAM ELLIS SCHOOLS TRUST Received: On time