Financial history THE ROBIN AND MARY GILL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 326025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £80.70k £38.66k £28.76k £23.28k £28.02k
Total expenditure £97.16k £30.36k £37.59k £33.90k £4.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A