Accounts and annual returns WARRINGTON EMMAUS FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 326034
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 05 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 13 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 13 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 02 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 02 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window