ABBADO EUROPEAN YOUNG MUSICIANS TRUST

Charity number: 326072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.25k £2.04k £1.49k £1.68k £2.04k
Total expenditure £3.71k £8.45k £4.17k £3.19k £4.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A