THE BRITISH ACADEMY OF WESTERN MEDICAL ACUPUNCTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We teach Western Medical Acupuncture to doctors, nurses and physiotherapists. We look to businesses and other donors to assist by paying the fees of nurses who are keen to expand their knowledge for the good of sick patients. Some of our nurses use acupuncture in the NHS and help patients by easing the symptoms of illness and can clear the patients entirely from the condition they present with.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 April 1982: Standard registration
- THE BRITISH ACADEMY OF MEDICAL WESTERN ACUPUNCTURE (Previous name)
- THE BRITISH ACADEMY OF WESTERN MEDICAL ACUPUNCTURE (Previous name)
- THE BRITISH ACADEMY OF WESTERN ACUPUNCTURE (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Doncaster | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony George Dickenson | Trustee | 23 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Esther Clare Nieman | Trustee | 23 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
JUSTIN SHANAHAN | Trustee | 23 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.02k | £19.47k | £27.56k | £20.56k | £20.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.62k | £14.99k | £17.38k | £19.79k | £19.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 MARCH 1982
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THROUGH THE APPLICATION OF THE PRINCIPLES OF THE SCIENCE OF ACUPUNCTURE THOSE WHO ARE SICK, DISABLED OR INFIRM (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE TRUST DEED)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
94 Crescent Road
Walton
Liverpool
Merseyside
L9 2AR
- Phone:
- 07792553429
- Email:
- J.SHANAHAN65@ME.COM
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window