THE GORDON RUSSELL TRUST

Charity number: 326446
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 March 2020 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 10 March 2020 131 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 05 July 2017 On time Download