THE GORDON RUSSELL TRUST

Charity number: 326446
Charity reporting is overdue by 30 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £56.47k £68.10k £56.79k £63.95k £78.70k
Total expenditure £55.52k £74.00k £74.60k £85.65k £93.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A