SUSTRANS

Charity number: 326550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £48.64m £46.81m £45.69m £63.50m £66.94m
Total expenditure £48.44m £46.82m £46.02m £63.44m £66.26m
Income from government contracts £10.08m £7.67m £5.36m £9.08m £7.24m
Income from government grants £30.29m £31.03m £460.61k £44.35m £51.61m
Income - Donations and legacies £3.61m £3.70m £3.70m £4.11m £4.43m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £44.87m £42.99m £41.80m £58.65m £62.18m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £166.00k £124.00k £188.00k £732.00k £330.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £75.33k £190.00k £0 £261.00k £73.79k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £47.61m £46.10m £45.16m £62.14m £65.35m
Expenditure - Raising funds £826.00k £716.00k £863.00k £1.30m £911.00k
Expenditure - Governance £38.00k £61.00k £0 £14.00k £629.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £23.48m £21.15m £0 £28.31m £35.23m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0