Accounts and annual returns THE WILFRED AND ELSIE ELKES CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 326573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 August 2021 08 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 August 2021 08 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 10 August 2020 23 June 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 August 2020 23 June 2021 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 10 August 2019 04 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 August 2019 04 March 2020 On time
Annual return 10 August 2018 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 August 2018 18 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 10 August 2017 13 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 August 2017 13 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window