Financial history THE WILFRED AND ELSIE ELKES CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 326573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 10/08/2017 10/08/2018 10/08/2019 10/08/2020 10/08/2021
Total gross income £129.06k £122.05k £116.40k £53.96k £63.76k
Total expenditure £132.28k £125.20k £139.83k £74.64k £108.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A