SOLLY LEBOFF CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 326661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.00k £949 £949 £693 £578
Total expenditure £400 £100 £625 £692 £617
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A