BRITISH SOCIETY FOR INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the BSID is to promote high quality scientific research in skin biology. This is achieved principally through the annual meeting, which comprises presentations of original research, guest lectures, and educational symposia. The Society is particularly keen to encourage the involvement of young scientists and clinicians in dermatological research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 December 1984: Standard registration
- B S I D (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Neil Rajan | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abigail Kate Langton | Trustee | 29 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.32k | £22.43k | £5.15k | £11.97k | £11.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.04k | £6.64k | £25.07k | £49.56k | £16.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 SEPTEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED 31 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF RESEARCH INTO THE NATURE AND FUNCTION OF SKIN IN HEALTH AND DISEASE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Willan House
4 Fitzroy Square
London
W1T 5HQ
- Phone:
- 02073830266
- Email:
- ukbsid@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window