THE CHRISTOPHER JOHN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 326774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 21 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 21 May 2020 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 26 March 2018 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required