Financial history THE SKELTON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 326824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £12.88k £12.80k £2.13k £3.38k £750
Total expenditure £12.75k £13.05k £2.50k £2.61k £1.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A