Financial history THE GOSLING FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 326840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £5.22m £4.84m £53.58m £4.03m £4.43m
Total expenditure £1.89m £2.21m £747.77k £2.07m £2.88m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £50.00m £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.22m £4.84m £3.58m £4.03m £4.43m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £50.00m £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.82m £2.20m £692.84k £1.84m £2.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £68.02k £12.38k £54.93k £235.62k £344.05k
Expenditure - Governance £74.22k £98.42k £85.34k £151.00k £144.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.74m £2.10m £607.50k £1.69m £2.39m
Expenditure - Investment management £68.02k £12.38k £34.84k £176.45k £334.05k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0