Financial history THE MEDLOCK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 326927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £508.57k £393.05k £407.86k £694.86k £1.86m
Total expenditure £1.32m £1.57m £1.99m £1.67m £2.30m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A N/A £289.43k £1.45m
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £1.45m
Income - Investment £508.57k N/A N/A £405.44k £414.69k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.24m N/A N/A £1.55m £2.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £66.35k N/A N/A £109.14k £182.67k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.24m N/A N/A £1.55m £2.11m
Expenditure - Investment management £47.04k N/A N/A £109.14k £182.67k
Expenditure - Other £7.53k N/A N/A £9.01k £8.00k