Financial history THE LYNN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 326944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £332.27k £323.37k £338.72k £240.76k £201.77k
Total expenditure £302.22k £286.85k £260.13k £157.99k £205.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A