Financial history THE DEREK WIGAN FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 326962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £325 £545 £210 £176 £0
Total expenditure £843 £1.25k £249 £210 £95
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A