THE M J SAMUEL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 327013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £98.90k £922.08k £119.43k £144.64k £96.25k
Total expenditure £100.91k £850.02k £446.27k £651.58k £472.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £78.61k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £93.48k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £750.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £823.13k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £26.90k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.67k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £821.46k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £26.90k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A