GIVE PEACE A CHANCE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To tell the public about the history and current activites of the peace movemement and to support the creation of a national peace museum
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 March 1986: Standard registration
- GPAC TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerald Drewett | Chair | 12 March 1986 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN DREWETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICOLA DREWETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.00k | £24.96k | £24.33k | £24.44k | £24.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.00k | £24.00k | £27.50k | £30.00k | £30.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 NOVEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 22 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE HISTORY AND CURRENT ACTIVITIES OF PEACE MOVEMENTS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES INCLUDING PUBLICATIONS, FILMS, DISPLAYS AND THE CREATION OF A NATIONAL PEACE MUSEUM. B. TO PROVIDE FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISEASE WHEREVER THE SAME MAY OCCUR. C. TO WORK TOWARDS ENABLING ALL PEOPLE TO ENJOY THEIR HUMAN RIGHTS AS SET OUT IN THE UNITED NATIONS DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS D. TO PROMOTE THE UNDERSTANDING AND PRACTICE OF NON VIOLENT RESOLUTION OF CONFLICTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Postwood Green
Hertford Heath
Hertford
SG13 7QJ
- Phone:
- 01992 416442
- Email:
- gerald.drewett@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window