Financial history THE ROUND SQUARE

Charity number: 327117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £1.10m £1.22m £1.22m £1.10m £1.11m
Total expenditure £1.07m £1.20m £1.22m £997.25k £1.12m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £59.66k £58.23k £107.07k £12.13k £6.22k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £1.49k £1.38k
Income - Charitable activities £1.02m £1.14m £1.11m £1.08m £1.10m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.33k £2.63k £1.53k £208 £79
Income - Other £22.22k £18.38k £4.71k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.07m £1.20m £1.22m £997.25k £1.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £77.42k £77.99k £61.15k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0