Governing document THE ROUND SQUARE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/04/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/10/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/08/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/09/2001 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28/09/2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE PRINCIPLES SET OUT IN THE APPENDIX HERETO.
Area of benefit
ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.