Accounts and annual returns THE TONY AND NORA SOUTHALL TRUST

Charity number: 327195
Charity reporting is overdue by 1569 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 108 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 108 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 473 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 473 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 838 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 838 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1203 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1203 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1569 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1569 days