PESTICIDE ACTION NETWORK UK

Charity number: 327215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 10 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 10 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 16 September 2016 On time Download