THE ISLAMIC CENTRE (MANCHESTER)

Charity number: 327235
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £381.78k £482.98k £316.84k £504.38k £489.85k
Total expenditure £180.78k £193.52k £112.59k £384.84k £530.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £266.38k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £124.09k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £102.21k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £11.70k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £384.84k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A