Financial history THE PARTNERSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 327329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £279.01k £312.91k £285.41k £314.13k £372.57k
Total expenditure £272.02k £322.55k £289.17k £310.38k £378.17k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A