Trustees THE KING FAHAD ACADEMY LIMITED
Charity number: 327342

Charity reporting is up to date (67 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prince Khalid Bin Bander Bin Sultan Bin Abdulaziz Al Saud | Chair | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hassan Saeed ALJOMAE | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
RASHED OBID ALSUBAIAI | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amal Jamel Fatani | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rusha Khalid Alrawaf | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.