Accounts and annual returns XSPAND - ST PIUS AID FOR THE NEEDY AND DESTITUTE

Charity number: 327344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 30 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 August 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 17 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 15 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required