Financial history OUR DAILY BREAD MINISTRIES TRUST

Charity number: 327384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.70m £1.67m £2.22m £2.27m £2.21m
Total expenditure £1.94m £2.08m £2.03m £1.94m £1.82m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £2.81k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.46m £1.42m £1.57m £1.70m £1.83m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £236.06k £245.05k £187.25k £254.02k £303.78k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £180 £327 £362 £112 £71
Income - Other £0 £0 £456.38k £311.07k £77.82k
Income - Legacies £181.53k £54.18k £166.13k £150.02k £91.76k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.94m £2.08m £2.03m £1.94m £1.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.64k £6.30k £6.74k £6.56k £8.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0