THE KARUNA TRUST

Charity number: 327461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.83m £1.76m £1.79m £1.82m £1.90m
Total expenditure £1.86m £1.81m £1.92m £1.86m £1.84m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.82m £1.74m £1.78m £1.81m £1.88m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £12.20k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.69k £13.57k £253 £12.32k £15.42k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £48.58k £4.94k £13.85k £149 £9.10k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.26m £1.19m £1.25m £1.16m £1.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds £601.13k £617.09k £671.72k £698.50k £680.07k
Expenditure - Governance £30.38k £23.90k £0 £27.15k £42.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £932.30k £880.48k £877.24k £799.66k £820.78k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0