Trustees INTERNATIONAL ALERT

Charity number: 327553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carey Cavanaugh Chair 01 August 2018
None on record
Richard Langstaff Trustee 01 November 2020
None on record
Emine Bozkurt Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
Professor Nina Fallentin Caspersen Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Erin Segilia Chase Trustee 09 July 2018
None on record
Hans Bolscher Trustee 17 May 2018
None on record
Abir Haj Ibrahim Trustee 17 May 2018
None on record
Lisa Lynn Rose Trustee 18 May 2017
None on record
Christopher Deri Trustee 26 May 2016
None on record