UNITED TRUSTS

Charity number: 327579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2019 19 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2018 19 November 2019 288 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2016 23 March 2017 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2016 Not Required