HOSTING FOR OVERSEAS STUDENTS

Charity number: 327592
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 01 October 2020 On time
Annual return 30 September 2019 15 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 27 February 2020 On time
Annual return 30 September 2018 16 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 23 May 2019 On time
Annual return 30 September 2017 28 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 15 May 2018 On time
Annual return 30 September 2016 06 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 01 June 2017 On time