HOSTING FOR OVERSEAS STUDENTS

Charity number: 327592
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £137.49k £149.09k £116.70k £134.46k £104.52k
Total expenditure £175.45k £145.35k £132.01k £137.24k £168.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A