THE SHANE GISBOROUGH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 327614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 24 March 2021 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 24 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 22 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 14 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 24 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required