R.O.I LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The institute's primary activity is the encouragement and development of oil painting. Exhibitions of work by members and selected non-members are held annually at the Mall Galleries, London. Significant prizes are on offer. Opportunities for inter-action with members are featured.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 December 1987: Standard registration
- ROI (Working name)
- ROI LIMITED (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Farmer | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Robert James Pointon | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Jane McKie | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Haidee-Jo Hewitt | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Martyn Walsom | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Luis Morris | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger Ferrin | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adebanji Alade | Trustee | 08 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Alexander | Trustee | 08 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Benson | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Webber | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Pilgrim | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN DAVID CRYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER JAMES WILEMAN ROI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £1.36k | £4.85k | £4.30k | £6.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.86k | £1.92k | £6.85k | £6.65k | £8.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 OCTOBER 1986
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE FINE ART OF ALL PAINTING WHICH NOWADAYS IS JUDGED TO INCLUDE ACRYLIC AND OTHER SYNTHETIC POLYMERS IN WHATEVER MANNER OR FORM BY ALL SUITABLE MEANS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3(I) - (VII).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FEDERATION OF BRITISH ARTISTS
17 CARLTON HOUSE TERRACE
LONDON
SW1Y 5BD
- Phone:
- 020 79306844
- Email:
- info@mallgalleries.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window