THE MARANATHA COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 327627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 June 2017 On time Download