Accounts and annual returns THE CRESCENT TRUST

Charity number: 327644
Charity reporting is overdue by 120 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 120 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 120 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 16 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window