Accounts and annual returns THE JOHN HARRIS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 327699
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 136 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 136 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 February 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 February 2020 18 days late