Accounts and annual returns ANGLO-FRENCH MEDICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 327706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 16 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 May 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 19 May 2021 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 22 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 22 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 30 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 06 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 06 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window